EP0855576 - Method and apparatus for measuring volume flow of flowing fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saeta GmbH & Co. KG Von-Siemens-Strasse 6 22880 Wedel / DE | [2010/03] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states ALFONS HAAR Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. Fangdieckstrasse 67 D-22547 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haar, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Mittelstieg 15 25469 Halstenbek / DE | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/31] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97101162.2 | 25.01.1997 | [1998/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0855576 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/00, G01F15/08 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
B67D7/78 (EP,US);
B67D7/08 (EP,US);
G01F1/00 (EP,US);
G01F1/74 (EP,US);
G01F15/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zum Messen des Volumens durchströmender Flüssigkeiten | [1998/31] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring volume flow of flowing fluids | [1998/31] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la mesure du débit d'un fluide en écoulement | [1998/31] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/41] | 30.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2200733 (BOPP & REUTHER GMBH) [A] 1,2,12,13 * page 5, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph L; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2335238 (SENING FA F A) [A] 1,2,12 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0039244 (CASHMORE PETER ROSEBY [GB]) [A] 3,13 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2; figure 5 *; | [A]US4763525 (COBB WESLEY N [US]) [A] 3,13* column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 27; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9118280 (JACKSON ROGER GEORGE [GB], et al) [A] 3,13 * page 1, line 6 - line 14 * * page 5, line 11 - line 31; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0494586 (WENNSTROEM AKTIEBOLAG F [SE], et al) [A] 1,3,12,13 * column 3, line 26 - column 5, line 29; figures 1,2 * |