EP0794097 - Relative spin speed traction control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE COMPANY 1000 Air Brake Avenue Wilmerding, PA 15148 / US | [2003/26] |
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE COMPANY 1000 Air Brake Avenue Wilmerding, PA 15148 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wood, James A. 710 Holtfield Terrace Spartanburg, South Carolina 29303 / US | 02 /
Schweikert, David E. 109 Stockton Lane Moore, South Carolina 29639 / US | 03 /
Greer, David A. 4272 Big Sky Ct. Gahanna, Ohio 43230 / US | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Petri, Stellan Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Petri, Stellan Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 41 88 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 97101207.5 | 27.01.1997 | [1997/37] | Priority number, date | US19960610727 | 04.03.1996 Original published format: US 610727 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0794097 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0794097 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794097 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
B60T8/1703 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1997/37] | Title | German: | Antriebssteuerung in Beziehung zur Relativ-Durchdrehgeschwindigkeit | [1997/37] | English: | Relative spin speed traction control | [1997/37] | French: | Commande de propulsion en fonction de la vitesse relative de patinage | [1997/37] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 16.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4896090 (BALCH EDGAR T [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 37 - column 7, line 56 *; | [A]US4987543 (WOOD JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract * |