Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1246897 | Global Dossier | 14.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI960199 | 05.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0788249 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2003 | B1 | EP0788249 | 06.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI960199 | 05.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR005701 | 14.07.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI960199 | 05.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9700189 | 29.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI960199 | 05.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2196121 | 06.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI960199 | 05.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69722981T | 19.05.2004 | T2 | DE69722981D1 | 31.07.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI960199 | 05.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1282063 | 09.03.1998 | B1 | ITMI960199 | 05.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI960199 | 05.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ314182 | 24.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI960199 | 05.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5956319 | 21.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI960199 | 05.02.1996 |