EP0773387 - Differential gear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.C. BAMFORD EXCAVATORS LIMITED Rocester Uttoxeter Staffordshire ST14 5JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states J.C. BAMFORD EXCAVATORS LIMITED Rocester Uttoxeter Staffordshire ST14 5JP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moeller, Frank The Paddock, 182 Main Road Milford, Stafford, ST17 OUN / GB | 02 /
Turner, William Stanley 32 Holly Road Uttoxeter, Staffordshire, ST14 7NY / GB | 03 /
Hicks, Raymond John Glanedn Bungalow, Gregrina Llandrindod wells, Powys, LD1 5SF / GB | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Leach, John N., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Leach, John Nigel, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97101570.6 | 06.10.1993 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | GB19920020971 | 06.10.1992 Original published format: GB 9220971 | GB19920020969 | 06.10.1992 Original published format: GB 9220969 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0773387 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0773387 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773387 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/62, F16H47/04, F16H3/66 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
F16H3/62 (EP,US);
F16H47/04 (EP,US);
F16H2037/088 (EP,US);
F16H2037/102 (EP,US);
F16H2037/103 (EP,US);
F16H2037/104 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2005 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2007 (EP,US);
F16H2200/201 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2012 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2023 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2043 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/20] | F16H3/62, F16H47/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/08] |
Former [1997/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Differentialgetriebe | [1997/20] | English: | Differential gear | [1997/20] | French: | Engrenage différentiel | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 05.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 10.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93922019.0 / EP0663048 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 29.08.2001 | LI | 29.08.2001 | NL | 29.08.2001 | LU | 06.10.2001 | MC | 06.10.2001 | DK | 29.11.2001 | PT | 29.11.2001 | GR | 30.11.2001 | [2015/21] |
Former [2005/23] | NL | 29.08.2001 | |
LU | 06.10.2001 | ||
MC | 06.10.2001 | ||
DK | 29.11.2001 | ||
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
GR | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/51] | NL | 29.08.2001 | |
MC | 06.10.2001 | ||
DK | 29.11.2001 | ||
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
GR | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | NL | 29.08.2001 | |
MC | 06.10.2001 | ||
DK | 29.11.2001 | ||
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 29.08.2001 | |
MC | 06.10.2001 | ||
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/43] | MC | 06.10.2001 | |
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | PT | 29.11.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR509738 (EDGAR HENRI DEVELAY [FR]) [A] 1,3,5 * page 2; figures 3,4,6 *; | [A]FR938913 (P JACOTTET ETS) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2227718 (ORSHANSKY TRANSMISSION CORP [US]) [A] 1,14,15,19,20 * page 16 - page 28, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]DE2429268 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,3,4,6,14 * page 7 - page 8; figures 2,5,7 * [A] 7-13; | [A]DE2724965 (SUNDSTRAND CORP) [A] 1,15,18-20* page 21; figure 6 *; | [XA]WO8706316 (MEYERLE MICHAEL) [X] 1,3,4,6,11,14,19,20 * abstract * [A] 13,15-17,21-31; | [X]US4802385 (HIRAIWA KAZUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,3,6-9,11,12,14 * column W * | by applicant | EP0663048 |