EP0790376 - Espagnolette lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, IT | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KFV Karl Fliether GmbH & Co. KG Siemensstrasse 10 42551 Velbert / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states KFV Karl Fliether GmbH & Co. KG Siemensstrasse 10 42549 Velbert / DE | ||
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states KARL FLIETHER GmbH & Co. Nevigeser Strasse 22 D-42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Ulrich Kuhlendahler Strasse 380 42555 Velbert / DE | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1997/34] | Grundmann, Dirk, Dr., et al Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 97101678.7 | 04.02.1997 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | DE19962002756U | 16.02.1996 Original published format: DE 29602756 U | [1997/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0790376 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0790376 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790376 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/18, E05C17/16 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
E05C17/166 (EP);
E05C9/1841 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/34] | Title | German: | Treibstangenverschluss | [1997/34] | English: | Espagnolette lock | [1997/34] | French: | Serrure à Crémone | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 27.06.2007 | IE | 27.06.2007 | SE | 27.09.2007 | AT | 04.02.2008 | GB | 04.02.2008 | IT | 04.02.2008 | ES | 05.02.2008 | BE | 28.02.2008 | CH | 29.02.2008 | FR | 29.02.2008 | LI | 29.02.2008 | [2010/05] |
Former [2009/30] | DK | 27.06.2007 | |
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
AT | 04.02.2008 | ||
GB | 04.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
FR | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | DK | 27.06.2007 | |
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 27.06.2007 | |
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 27.06.2007 | |
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | IE | 27.06.2007 | |
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | SE | 27.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT366750B (GRUNDMANN ROHRBACHER SCHLOSSER [AT]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3503466 (GRUNDMANN ROHRBACHER SCHLOSSER [AT]) [DA] 1,6* the whole document *; | [DA]DE29509503U (GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,6 * the whole document * |