EP0790083 - Apparatus for coating substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Singulus Technologies AG Junkersstrasse 1 63755 Alzenau / DE | [1998/24] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states Singulus Technologies AG Junkersstrasse 1 63755 Alzenau / DE | ||
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states Singulus Technologies GmbH Junkersstrasse 1 63755 Alzenau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sichmann, Eggo Deutschordenstrasse 31 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 02 /
Gerigk, Reinhard Uferweg 20 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Heunemann, Dieter Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Heunemann, Dieter, Dr. Vossius & Partner, Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97101702.5 | 04.02.1997 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | DE1996105600 | 15.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19605600 | [1997/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0790083 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0790083 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B05C11/08, B05C11/10, G01F23/24, G01F25/00 | [1998/29] | CPC: |
B05C11/08 (EP);
B05C11/10 (EP);
B05C11/1039 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/34] | B05C11/08, B05C11/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1997/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Oberflächen-beschichtung bzw. zum Lackieren von Substraten | [1997/34] | English: | Apparatus for coating substrates | [1997/34] | French: | Dispositif pour revêtir des substrats | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/42] | 17.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5405443 (AKIMOTO MASAMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 6 - column 7; figure - *; | [Y]EP0668488 (ENDRESS HAUSER GMBH CO [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0334535 (PIRELLI GENERAL PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 26 - line 45; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH06124487 ; | [A]GB2168153 (HOPKINSONS LTD) [A] 1,2,4-6 * abstract *; | [A]GB2043259 (DREXELBROOK CONTROLS) [A] 1,2,4-6,8 * page 2, line 29 - line 40 * * page 3, line 1 - line 14 * * page 4, line 13 - line 27; figure - *; | [A]US4244385 (HOTINE WILLIAM) [A] 3 * abstract *; | [A]US1532871 (GEORGE BLOCH FRANZ) [A] 7 * page 1, line 11 - line 33; figure - *; | [A]DE29512500U (LEYBOLD AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940804), vol. 018, no. 417, Database accession no. (P - 1781), & JP06124487 A 19940506 (KURARAY CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |