EP0790009 - Fastener, particularly for sports shoes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.03.1999 [1999/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A. Via Montebelluna 5/7 31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | [1997/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorza, Roberto Via C. Rizzarda 15 32032 Feltre (Prov. of Belluno) / IT | 02 /
Battistella, Mirco Via Montello 48/1 31027 Spresiano (Prov. of Treviso) / IT | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97101897.3 | 06.02.1997 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | IT1996TV00010U | 14.02.1996 Original published format: IT TV960010 U | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0790009 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0790009 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A43C11/14 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
A43C11/148 (EP);
A43C11/142 (EP);
A43C11/1486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT [1997/34] | Title | German: | Verschluss, insbesondere für Sportschuhe | [1997/34] | English: | Fastener, particularly for sports shoes | [1997/34] | French: | Fermeture, en particulier pour chaussures de sport | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3132042 (NORDICA) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2507445 (WARRINGTON) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0712589 (LANGE INT.) [PA] 1 * the whole document * |