EP0799814 - Method for the hydrogenation of aromatic compounds containing at least one hydroxyl group bound to an aromatic nucleus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rütter, Heinz, Dr. Am Bildstöck 15 67126 Hochdorf-Assenheim / DE | 02 /
Rühl, Thomas, Dr. Brunnengasse 17 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 03 /
Breitscheidel, Boris, Dr. Eduard-Goebel-Strasse 11 36043 Fulda / DE | 04 /
Henkelmann, Jochem, Dr. Bassermannstrasse 25 68165 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
Wettling, Thomas, Dr. Trifelsring 11 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Frohwitter-Geissler & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97101967.4 | 07.02.1997 | [1997/41] | Priority number, date | DE19961004791 | 09.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19604791 | [1997/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0799814 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0799814 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | [1997/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799814 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/20, C07C35/08, B01J23/46 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
B01J23/89 (EP,US);
B01J23/462 (EP,US);
C07C29/20 (EP,US);
C12C11/02 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/20, C07C35/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Hydrierung von aromatischen Verbindungen, in denen mindestens eine Hydroxylgruppe an einen aromatischen Kern gebunden ist | [1997/41] | English: | Method for the hydrogenation of aromatic compounds containing at least one hydroxyl group bound to an aromatic nucleus | [1997/41] | French: | Procédé pour la hydrogénation de composés aromatiques avec au moins un groupe hydroxyle lié à un noyau aromatique | [1997/41] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 25.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2023832 (SCHALLER ELECTRONIC) [X] 9,10 * Tabel V, catalyseur N, P * * Beispiel 7, catalyseur N1, N2, N3 *; | [X]DE2458587 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) [X] 9,10 * example 3 *; | [DX]DE2909663 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO, et al) [DX] 1-10 * claims 1-6,8 *; | [X]US4424162 (ROSEN BRUCE I [US]) [X] 9,10* Spalte 6, Catalyst D *; | [X]EP0147751 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE]) [X] 9,10 * Seite 19, Katalysator K6 *; | [E]WO9710202 (BASF AG [DE]) [E] 9,10 * claim 8 * | by applicant | PL137526 | US2927127 | DE2909663 | DE3401343 |