Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0799814
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.06.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
20.07.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] |
04.08.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] |
04.07.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.03.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.03.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.03.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.11.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.09.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.09.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.05.1999 |
First examination report |
|
19.05.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.03.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.05.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] |
03.10.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 19.11.1997 [1997/47] |
22.08.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] |