EP0793407 - Electronic switching device, particularly electronic relay, for plug-in mounting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Logistics AG AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [2003/16] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Logistics AG AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | ||
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Samray, Bican Friedrichstrasse 35 16321 Schönow / DE | 02 /
Villain, Jürgen, Dr. Breite Strasse 42 A 14199 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Schlaak, Helmut, Dr. Schwabstedter Weg 30 A 13503 Berlin / DE | [1997/37] |
Former [1997/36] | 01 /
Samray, Bican Friedrichstrasse 35 16321 Schönow / DE | ||
02 /
Villain, Jürgen, Dr. Breite Strasse 42 A 14199 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
Schlaak, Helmut, Dr. Schwabstedter Weg 30 A 13503 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion AMP International Enterprises Limited AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach (SG) / CH | Application number, filing date | 97102088.8 | 10.02.1997 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | DE1996106885 | 23.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19606885 | [1997/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0793407 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0793407 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0793407 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H05K7/00, H05K5/00 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
H05K5/0039 (EP);
H05K7/20854 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/36] | H05K7/20, H05K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/36] | Title | German: | Elektronische Schalteinrichtung, insbesondere elektronisches Relais, für Steckmontage | [1997/37] | English: | Electronic switching device, particularly electronic relay, for plug-in mounting | [1997/36] | French: | Installation électronique de distribution, particulièrement relais électronique, pour montage enfichage | [1997/36] |
Former [1997/36] | Elektronische Schalteinrichtung,insbesondere elektronisches Relais,für Steckmontage | Examination procedure | 06.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 24.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 16.04.2003 | GB | 16.04.2003 | IT | 16.04.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 16.04.2003 | |
GB | 16.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 16.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3035749 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 8* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [DA]DE3716196 (TERADYNE INC [US]) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0516149 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,5-7 * column 6, line 9 - column 6, line 24 * * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 5 * * column 9, line 55 - column 10, line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4121545 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 5; figures 1-3 * |