EP0790111 - Release agent for clay mouldings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [2007/14] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | ||
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states ATOFINA Research Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | ||
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states FINA RESEARCH S.A. Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Elmbt, Reginald Ch. de Wavre, 97 5030 Gembloux / BE | 02 /
Van Oostende, Lionel 34, rue Dijon 8000 Amiens / FR | 03 /
Navette, Raymond Rue de Thyle, 3/4 1495 Villers-la-ville / BE | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger, et al Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger, et al Cabinet Hirsch 34 rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97102117.5 | 11.02.1997 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | EP19960102267 | 15.02.1996 Original published format: EP 96102267 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0790111 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790111 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/38 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
B28B7/384 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IE, LI, NL, SE [1997/34] | Title | German: | Trennmittel für Formlinge aus Ton | [1997/34] | English: | Release agent for clay mouldings | [1997/34] | French: | Agent de démoulage pour articles moulés en argile | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2002 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 08.02.2002 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 11.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Request for further processing for: | 26.08.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.09.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | [2008/12] |
Former [2008/08] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0561465 (UNICHEMA CHEMIE BV) [A] 1-7 * page 3, line 6 - line 47 *; | [AD]JPS5220986 ; | [A]EP0678363 (CHRYSO S.A.) [A] 1-7 * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 26 *; | [A]US5133804 (D.H.CULPON, JR.) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8505066 (KEMISK VAERK KOGE A/S) [A] 1,4-6 * claims 1,7,8,12-25,37,43-45 *; | [A]DE9415093U (A.EISL) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0002891 (UNION CARBIDE) [A] 1 * page 1, line 3 - page 3, line 25 * | [AD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 77, no. 13, Database accession no. 77-22664Y, XP002008236 & JPS5220986 A 19770217 (NIPPON OIL KK) [AD] 1-7 * abstract * | by applicant | JP19750097840 | JP19910168390 |