EP0790261 - Process for preparing beads of polymers having an acrylic basis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2000/34] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris Cédex 42 / FR | ||
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states ATOHAAS HOLDING C.V. Schipholpoort 60 2034 MB Haarlem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giberti, Fabio Via Giuseppe Pogliani 14 Paderno Dugnano (MI) / IT | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Sama, Daniele, et al Sama Patents Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Sama, Daniele, Dr., et al Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97102125.8 | 11.02.1997 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | IT1996MI00312 | 19.02.1996 Original published format: IT MI960312 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0790261 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0790261 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790261 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08F265/04, C08F220/10 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
C08F265/04 (EP,US);
C08F20/10 (KR);
C08F2/18 (KR);
C08F220/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Perlpolymerisaten aus Acrylaten | [1997/34] | English: | Process for preparing beads of polymers having an acrylic basis | [1997/34] | French: | Procédé de préparation de polymères acryliques sous forme de perles | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 11.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3887652 (CARROCK FREDERICK E, et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, line 46-64 ; column 2, line 7-40 ; column 3, line 24-45 ; column 3, line 56-column 4, line 10 ; column 5, line 49-63 *; column 6, lines 32-34; table A *; | [Y]US3943190 (ABE TAKEAKI, et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]DE2455133 (BEIERSDORF AG) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [Y]US3976629 (HAYWARD MALCOLM EDWIN, et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 4, lines 15-16 *; | [A]EP0477708 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [A] 8,9 * page 5, line 23-25 *; page 3, lines 35-55 *; | [A]EP0517373 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]EP0572115 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 23-36 ; page 4, line 45-54*; page 3, lines 6-43 *; | [Y]EP0683182 (ATOCHEM ELF ITALIA [IT]) [Y] 1-9 * Examples 3-9 ; page 3, line 12-55 ; page 1, line 18-19 ; page 4, line 18-20 ; page4, line 45 *; page 4, lines 52-56 *; | [T]EP0774471 (ATOHAAS HOLDING CV [NL]) [T] 6,7 * page 3, line 40-50 ; page 3, line 30-39 ; page 2, line 50-53 ; * abstract *; page 4, line 10 * | by applicant | EP0457356 |