EP0801279 - Process for drying a substance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roediger Anlagenbau GmbH Kinzigheimer Weg 104 D-63450 Hanau / DE | [1997/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Effertz, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing. Hanauer Landstrasse 33a D-63457 Hanau / DE | 02 /
Mannert, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Marktstrasse 37 D-60388 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
Dolderer, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Einsteinstrasse 13 D-73432 Aalen / DE | 04 /
Engert, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Hainal 4 D-63457 Hanau / DE | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 97102267.8 | 13.02.1997 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | DE1996105146 | 13.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19605146 | [1997/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0801279 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0801279 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F26B11/04, F26B23/02, F26B25/00 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
F26B25/005 (EP);
C02F11/10 (EP);
F26B23/022 (EP);
Y02W10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/04] |
Former [1997/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Trocknen einer Substanz | [1997/42] | English: | Process for drying a substance | [1997/42] | French: | Procédé de séchage d'une substance | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1997 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 27.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/09] | 21.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.05.1997 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1997 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1997 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1997 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1997 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1997 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1997 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1997 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.04.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]BE567659 (DE PERMENTIER) [X] 1,5,10 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4,6-9,11; | [YA]DE4305543 (KRAFTWERK-, SCHLAMMTECHNOLOGIE UND ENTSORGUNGSBERATUNG GMBH) [Y] 2,11 * the whole document * [A] 6,10; | [YA]US1820986 (PEEBLES) [Y] 4,9 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,6,8,10,11; | [YA]WO9201897 (FRITZ EGGER GES.M.B.H.) [Y] 6,7 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,5,10,11; | [YA]WO9324800 (ANDRITZ TCW ENGINEERING GMBH) [Y] 8 * page 10 - page 11; figure 1 * * page 27 - page 28; figures 8,9 * [A] 3,4,6; | [XA]FR1166152 (SOCIÉTÉ ALSACIENNE DE CONSTRUCTIONS MÉCANIQUES) [X] 10 * the whole document * [A] 1,5,9; | [DA]EP0457203 (KUNZ ET AL) [DA] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4411074 (DALY) [A] 1,6,9-11 * column W *; | [A]DE4427236 (LIMEX GMBH) [A] 1,6,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2851005 (GEVA) |