EP0793111 - Malfunction diagnosis system and method for on-vehicle electronic control units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Satoshi 1-5-17, Itsutsugaoka Toyota-shi, Achi-ken 471 / JP | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103049.9 | 25.02.1997 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | JP19960038243 | 26.02.1996 Original published format: JP 3824396 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0793111 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0793111 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0793111 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/00, B60R16/02 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
G01R31/007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/36] | G01R31/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/36] | Title | German: | Funktionsstörungsdiagnosesystem und Verfahren für ein in einem Fahrzeug installiertes elektronisches Steuergerät | [1997/36] | English: | Malfunction diagnosis system and method for on-vehicle electronic control units | [1997/36] | French: | Système et procédé pour diagnostiquer des défauts de fonctionnement d'une unité de commande électronique installée dans un véhicule | [1997/36] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 27.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4484263 (OLSON DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1,7* column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 5; claims 17,18 *; | [A]GB2213609 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * page 5, line 20 - page 7, line 17; figure 2A; claim 4 * |