EP0793392 - Method and apparatus for the transmission and the reception of three-dimensional television signals of stereoscopic images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | ||
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanno, Kinya Shin Ashiyakami, 29-ban M-1105 Osakafu, Suita-shi 565 / JP | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 97103112.5 | 26.02.1997 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | JP19960043506 | 29.02.1996 Original published format: JP 4350696 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0793392 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0793392 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
H04N5/445 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/117 (EP,US);
H04N13/122 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N13/239 (EP,US);
H04N13/243 (EP,US);
H04N13/279 (EP,US);
H04N13/30 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N13/221 (EP,US);
H04N13/257 (EP,US);
H04N13/261 (EP,US);
H04N13/289 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Übertragung und zum Empfang dreidimensionaler Fernsehsignale von stereoskopischen Bildern | [1997/36] | English: | Method and apparatus for the transmission and the reception of three-dimensional television signals of stereoscopic images | [1997/36] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la transmission et la réception de signaux télévision à trois dimensions d'images stéréoscopiques | [1997/36] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 15.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4062045 (IWANE WARO) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 28 * * column 15, line 16 - column 20, line 43; table 1 *; | [A]WO9519093 (FUISZ RICHARD C [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 24; figure 2 * * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 7 ** page 5, line 7 - line 34; figure 4 *; | [A] - KOCH R, "3-D SURFACE RECONSTRUCTION FROM STEREOSCOPIC IMAGE SEQUENCES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, CAMBRIDGE, MA., JUNE 20 - 23, 1995, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19950620), no. CONF. 5, pages 109 - 114, XP000557058 [A] 1-7 * page 109, line 1 - page 112, paragraph 3 * |