EP0793146 - Photoimageable, dielectric, crosslinkable, copolyester film-forming mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 352 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 354 Henry Administration Building, 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Economy, James 105 Whitehall Court Urbana, IL 61801 / US | 02 /
Schneggenburger, Lizabeth A. 1107 East Florida Avenue, Apt. 32 A Urbana, IL 61801 / US | 03 /
Shi, Fang 508 West Green Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/36] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103348.5 | 28.02.1997 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | US19960609465 | 01.03.1996 Original published format: US 609465 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0793146 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/027 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
H01L23/5329 (EP,US);
G03F7/027 (EP,US);
H01L23/49894 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/36] | Title | German: | Photostrukturierbares, dielektrisches, vernetzbares, copolyesterfilmbildendes Gemisch | [1997/36] | English: | Photoimageable, dielectric, crosslinkable, copolyester film-forming mixture | [1997/36] | French: | Mélange réticulable, diélectrique, photosensible, formant un film de copolyester | [1997/36] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 03.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/24] | 15.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0186091 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 7,9 * page 7, line 36 - line 44 * * page 8 * * page 9, line 1 - line 23 *; | [X]EP0360579 (M & T CHEMICALS INC [US]) [X] 7 * page 4, line 27 - line 30 *; | [XY]EP0235704 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 7,9 * page 49; example 87; claim - * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]US5439541 (ECONOMY JAMES [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 20 - line 27 * * column 7, line 1 - line 25 * * column 8, line 1 - line 25 * |