EP0794283 - Composite papermaking fabric with paired weft binder yarns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstenJohnson, Inc. 48 Richardson Side Road Kanata, Ontario K2K 1X2 / CA | [2005/12] |
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states Seabrook, Ronald H. 21 Jonathan Pack Street Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1C4 / CA | ||
For all designated states Johnson, Dale B. 512 Fraser Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K2A 2R2 / CA | |||
For all designated states Chaplin, Derek G. 45 Kalbrook Street Kanata, Ontario K2T 1A6 / CA | |||
For all designated states Barrett, Rex 165 Morallion Hills Peachtree City, Georgia 30269 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seabrook, Ronald H. 21 Jonathan Pack Street Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1C4 / CA | 02 /
Johnson, Dale B. 512 Fraser Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K2A 2R2 / CA | 03 /
Chaplin, Derek G. 5 Henshall Road,Bollington Macclesfield, Cheshire, SK10 5HX / GB | 04 /
Barrett, Rex 165 Morallion Hills Peachtree City, Georgia / US | [2005/28] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
Seabrook, Ronald H. 21 Jonathan Pack Street Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1C4 / CA | ||
02 /
Johnson, Dale B. 512 Fraser Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K2A 2R2 / CA | |||
03 /
Chaplin, Derek G. 45 Kalbrook Street Kanata, Ontario K2T 1A6 / CA | |||
04 /
Barrett, Rex 165 Morallion Hills Peachtree City, Georgia / US | |||
Former [1997/37] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/37] | Schmidt, Christian, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103574.6 | 04.03.1997 | [1997/37] | Priority number, date | GB19960004602 | 04.03.1996 Original published format: GB 9604602 | CA19962192729 | 12.12.1996 Original published format: CA 2192729 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0794283 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794283 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0794283 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/00 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
D21F1/0045 (EP,US);
Y10S162/903 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3179 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/37] | Title | German: | Papiermacher Verbundgewebe mit gepaarten Verbindungsschussfäden | [1997/37] | English: | Composite papermaking fabric with paired weft binder yarns | [1997/37] | French: | Toile composite pour machine à papier contenant des paires de fils de trame de liaison intercouche | [1997/37] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 26.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US4501303 (OESTERBERG LARS B [SE]) [DX] 1-4,6,7* column W *; | [X]US5152326 (VOEHRINGER FRITZ [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * column W * |