EP0794691 - Method of and device for accurately detecting end of usage lifetime of a discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/37] | Device for accurately detecting end of usage lifetime of a discharge lamp | ||
[2000/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-City Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyama, Koichi c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | 02 /
Kato, Koichi c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | 03 /
Aida, Kenji c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Vollnhals, Aurel, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Vollnhals, Aurel, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103652.0 | 05.03.1997 | [1997/37] | Priority number, date | JP19960049272 | 06.03.1996 Original published format: JP 4927296 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0794691 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0794691 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | [1998/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794691 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/03, H05B41/292 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
H05B41/2925 (EP,US);
H05B47/20 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/23] | H05B37/03, H05B41/29 | ||
Former IPC [1997/37] | H05B37/03 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1997/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum genauen Detektieren des Lebensdauerendes einer Entladungslampe | [2000/08] | English: | Method of and device for accurately detecting end of usage lifetime of a discharge lamp | [2000/08] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour détecter de manière fiable la fin de la durée de vie d'une lampe à décharge | [2000/08] |
Former [1997/37] | Anordnung zum genauen Detektieren des Lebensdauerendes einer Entladungslampe | ||
Former [1997/37] | Device for accurately detecting end of usage lifetime of a discharge lamp | ||
Former [1997/37] | Dispositif pour détecter de manière fiable la fin de la durée de vie d'une lampe à décharge | Examination procedure | 13.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 09.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0642296 (SMI SYST MICROELECT INNOVAT [DE]) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 44; figure 1 *; | [X]DE4331378 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 63; figures 1,2,7 *; | [X]US4949018 (SIGLOCK JOHN V [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 34; figures 1,2 * |