EP0796692 - Apparatus and method for cutting off and guiding trailing and leading ends of running stock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/21] |
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grenz, Günter Gather Strasse 38 40670 Meerbusch / DE | 02 /
Oeztuerk, Nurettin Lessing Strasse 62 41541 Dormagen / DE | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [1997/39] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103798.1 | 07.03.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | DE1996111302 | 22.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19611302 | [1997/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0796692 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0796692 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B23D33/02, B21B15/00 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
B23D33/02 (EP,US);
B21B15/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, IT, SE [1997/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abtrennen und Ableiten von Vorder- und/oder Hinterschopfen an laufendem Walzgut | [1997/39] | English: | Apparatus and method for cutting off and guiding trailing and leading ends of running stock | [1997/39] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour couper et pour guider les ébouts d'une matière laminée en mouvement | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 04.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2900013 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG) [X] 1,5,7-9,13-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0618033 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]) [X] 1,3,8* the whole document * |