EP0794212 - Polyester resin aqueous dispersion and process for preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITIKA LTD. No. 50, Higashihonmachi 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states UNITIKA LTD. No. 50, Higashihonmachi 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Eiji 25-25, Uji-Zyazuka Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Miyagawa, Tetsuya 322-B, 55, Uji-Kageyama Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Shiba, Kenjin Sanroiyaru Yawata 403, 11-3 Yawata-cho 2-chome Nada-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | 04 /
Xu, Jinhua 30-3-412, Uji-Tonouchi Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | 05 /
Hata, Kiyomi 32, Uji-Satojiri Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1997/43] |
Former [1997/37] | 01 /
Fujita, Eiji 25-25, Uji-Zyazuka Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | ||
02 /
Miyagawa, Tetsuya 322-B, 55, Uji-Kageyama Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | |||
03 /
Shiba, Kenjin 342-B, 55, Uji-Kageyama Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | |||
04 /
Xu, Jinhua 30-3-412, Uji-Tonouchi Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | |||
05 /
Hata, Kiyomi 32, Uji-Satojiri Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103863.3 | 07.03.1997 | [1997/37] | Priority number, date | JP19960051362 | 08.03.1996 Original published format: JP 5136296 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0794212 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/03, // C08L67:02 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
C08J3/03 (EP,US);
C08J3/07 (KR);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08J2367/03 (KR);
C08L2201/54 (KR);
C08L67/03 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/37] | Title | German: | Wässrige Dispersion von Polyesterharz und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1997/37] | English: | Polyester resin aqueous dispersion and process for preparing the same | [1997/37] | French: | Dispersion aqueuse de résine de polyester et procédé pour sa préparation | [1997/37] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 30.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/03] | 23.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.05.1997 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   21.05.1997 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1528221 (CEAN SPA) [Y] 1,2,6-10 * claims 1,15,17,18 *; | [XY]EP0520266 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-10 * page 3, line 51 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, lines 26-29 * * page 4, line 46 - page 5, line 4 * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 7 * * page 7, lines 22-23 * * examples 1-10 * * claims 1,3,7,11,12 * [Y] 1,2,6-10; | [A] - C.R. MARTENS, TECHNOLOGY OF PAINTS, VERNISHES AND LACQUERS, NEW YORK - AMSTERDAM - LONDON, REINHOLD BOOK CORPORATION, (1968), XP002033408 [A] * page 513 - page 521 * |