EP0807451 - Fixing plate for safety harness for guiding two crossing belts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meckel GmbH Sicherheitssysteme In der Welsmicke 4 57399 Kirchhundem / DE | [1997/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Söll, Peter Alte Plauener Strasse 61 95028 Hof / DE | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97104201.5 | 13.03.1997 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | DE1996208883U | 17.05.1996 Original published format: DE 29608883 U | DE1996217932U | 15.10.1996 Original published format: DE 29617932 U | [1997/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0807451 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0807451 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | [1999/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/00 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
A62B35/0031 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/47] | Title | German: | Halteplatte für ein Sicherheitsgeschirr zur Führung von zwei sich kreuzenden Gurten | [1997/47] | English: | Fixing plate for safety harness for guiding two crossing belts | [1997/47] | French: | Platine de fixation de harnais de sécurité pour guider deux ceintures croisées | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE8914878U (MITTELMANN ARMATUREN GMBH + CO KG) [AD] 1,9 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 8, line 2; figure - *; | [AD]DE4224334 (MANFRED MECKEL FABRIK FUER SIC [DE]) [AD] 1,9 * page 4, line 34 - page 6, line 8; figure - * |