EP0798044 - Triturating machine with material selection and rotating compactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFA S.r.l. Zona Industriale 90018 Termini Imerese (Palermo) / IT | [1997/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barone, Giuseppe Via Senatore Edoardo Battaglia 36 90018 Termini Imerese (PA) / IT | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph Via di Citille, 85 50022 Greve in Chianti (FI) / IT | [2009/49] |
Former [2002/03] | O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph Via di Citille, 85 50022 Greve (FI) / IT | ||
Former [2000/15] | O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph Via del Parione, 8 50123 Firenze / IT | ||
Former [1997/40] | O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph Via dei Tornabuoni, 9 I-50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 97104244.5 | 13.03.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | IT1996PA00005 | 26.03.1996 Original published format: IT PA960005 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0798044 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B02C18/40, B02C18/22, B30B9/30, B02C18/14 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
B30B15/08 (EP,US);
B02C18/0084 (EP,US);
B02C18/14 (EP,US);
B02C18/22 (EP,US);
B30B9/3035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/40] | Title | German: | Zerkleinerungsmaschine mit Materialsortierung und drehbarem Verdichter | [1997/40] | English: | Triturating machine with material selection and rotating compactor | [1997/40] | French: | Appareil de broyage avec sélection de matériau et compacteur rotatif | [1997/40] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 24.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 05.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/16] | Request for further processing for: | 31.10.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.05.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2001 | 31.03.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8804578 (SANDARNE IND AB [SE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3907813 (TEZUKA KOSAN KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5048764 (FLAMENT GREGORY J [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0543763 (NICOLETTI AGREGATS S A [FR], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]FR2690094 (COURBET GERARD [FR]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0589281 (SCHLEICHER & CO INT [DE]) [A] 1,10 * column 7, line 10 - line 12; figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]FR2701874 (MORANA BENITO [FR]) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; | [A]GB2277247 (BISHOP TIMOTHY ROGER [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,10 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0682983 (ALFA SRL [IT]) [AD] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29515698U (GMEINER TIMO [DE]) [A] 1,5,10 * the whole document *; | [A]NL9401060 (KIGGEN BEHEER BV [NL]) [A] 1-3,10 * abstract * |