EP0800086 - Control solution and method for testing the performance of an electrochemical device for determining the concentration of an analyte in blood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER CORPORATION 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | ||
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ye, Ling 3904 Coventry Lane No. 2B, Mishawaka, Indiana 46545 / US | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Burkert, Frank, et al Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Building Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Burkert, Frank, et al Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97104648.7 | 19.03.1997 | [1997/41] | Priority number, date | US19960625132 | 01.04.1996 Original published format: US 625132 | [1997/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800086 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800086 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/96, C12Q1/00 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
C12Q1/004 (EP,US);
G01N33/96 (EP,US);
G01N2496/35 (EP,US);
Y10S435/817 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/41] | Title | German: | Kontrolllösung und Verfahren um die Leistung einer elektrochemischen Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Konzentration eines Analyten im Blut zu testen | [1997/41] | English: | Control solution and method for testing the performance of an electrochemical device for determining the concentration of an analyte in blood | [1997/41] | French: | Une solution de contrôle et procédé pour tester la performance d'un dispositif électrochimique pour la détermination d'un analyte | [1997/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 27.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 26.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2003 | BE | 02.01.2003 | GR | 02.01.2003 | IE | 19.03.2003 | LU | 19.03.2003 | PT | 02.04.2003 | [2007/04] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
BE | 02.01.2003 | ||
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
LU | 19.03.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
BE | 02.01.2003 | ||
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 02.01.2003 | |
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | PT | 02.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8911654 (AKERKAR ANAND [US]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5312590 (GUNASINGHAM HARI [SG]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 54 - line 61 *; | [DY]WO9513535 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM CORP [US]) [DY] 1-11 * claim - *; | [A] - VERHAPPEN I, "THE EFFECTS OF "WINTERIZING" PH BUFFERS", ADVANCES IN INSTRUMENTATION AND CONTROL, (19930101), vol. 48, no. PART 01, pages 153 - 177, XP000434458 [A] 1-11 |