EP0797026 - Friction wheel drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY John Deere Road Moline Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seegert, Brian David 824 Hickory Lane Hartford, Wisconsin 53027 / US | 02 /
Henning, Royal Aaron N5806 Buchanan Road Hartford, Wisconsin 53027 / US | 03 /
Sebben, Daniel Angelo 1504 Green Tree Road West Bend, Wisconsin 53095 / US | 04 /
Zellmer, Timothy Paul 809 Lynn Street Horicon, Wisconsin 53032 / US | 05 /
Cameron, William Garrald N6295 Sunset Road Juneau, Wisconsin 53039 / US | 06 /
Hutchison, Wayne Robert N7840 Highway TW Mayville, Wisconsin 53050 / US | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al Deere & Company European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1997/39] | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97104664.4 | 19.03.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | US19960621278 | 22.03.1996 Original published format: US 621278 | [1997/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0797026 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0797026 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0797026 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/02, A01D34/74 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
F16H15/02 (EP,US);
Y10S56/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/39] | F16H15/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/39] | Title | German: | Reibradantrieb | [1997/39] | English: | Friction wheel drive | [1997/39] | French: | Entraînement par friction de roues | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 15.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US807176 (KING GEORGE W [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure -; claims 1,2 * [Y] 3,7,8,10; | [YA]US3396519 (LEHMAN ROBERT E) [Y] 3,7,8,10 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 27 * * figures 3,4,8 * [A] 6,9; | [X]US4271378 (KNAUFF ROBERT J) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * figure 4 *; | [X]AU573971B (LINSON SMITH L) [X] 1-3 * figure 2 *; | [X]DE517030 (EDUARD MEYER MASCHF) [X] 1,2 * figure - *; | [X]US751878 (SPANGLER) [X] 1,2 * figure - *; | [X]US3481213 (MACCHIA SALVATORE LA) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 10 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]US5390479 (HUTCHISON WAYNE R [US], et al); | [A]EP0475021 (DEERE & CO [US]) |