EP0822315 - Circuitry for controlling electrically powered drives for roller blinds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ernst Selve GmbH & Co. KG Werdohler Landstrasse 286 D-58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | [1998/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiper, Jost Dr. Lohweg 24 D-57076 Siegen / DE | 02 /
Achenbach, Jens. Am Gehäge 7 D-58515 Lüdenscheid / DE | 03 /
Hoffmann, Helmut Fasanenweg 3 D-57489 Drolshagen / DE | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Köchling, Döring PartG mbB Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling, Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97104917.6 | 22.03.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | DE1996130491 | 29.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19630491 | [1998/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0822315 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0822315 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822315 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/88 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
H02P25/04 (EP);
E06B9/88 (EP);
H02P23/24 (EP);
E06B2009/6872 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/06] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Steuerung von elektomotorischen Antrieben für auf-und abwickelbare Behänge | [1998/06] | English: | Circuitry for controlling electrically powered drives for roller blinds | [1998/06] | French: | Circuit de contrôle de moteurs électriques pour stores enroulables | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.12.2002 | GB | 04.12.2002 | IT | 04.12.2002 | NL | 04.12.2002 | AT | 22.03.2003 | BE | 31.03.2003 | CH | 31.03.2003 | LI | 31.03.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 04.12.2002 | |
GB | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
AT | 22.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | GB | 04.12.2002 | |
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
AT | 22.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | GB | 04.12.2002 | |
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 04.12.2002 | |
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 04.12.2002 | |
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 04.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4499463 (JACQUEL DOMINIQUE [FR]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 49 - line 53 *; | [A]EP0152888 (SELVE ERNST GMBH CO KG [DE]); | [A]DE3803119 (SCHWENK KG THEBEN WERK [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0426577 (SIMU SA [FR]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4106033 (WAREMA RENKHOFF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 28 - line 49 *; | [A]DE4221640 (MICROSONIC GES FUER MIKROELEKT [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 5 - line 31 *; | [A]EP0703344 (KLENK GOTTLIEB [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * |