EP0801087 - Moisture-curing one-component polyurethane composition for reversible covering of a solid base [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [1997/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Dieter Drosselstieg 8 21635 Jork / DE | 02 /
Kehler, Harald, Dr. Kirchdorfer Strasse 188 21109 Hamburg / DE | [1997/42] | Application number, filing date | 97104930.9 | 22.03.1997 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | DE1996114277 | 11.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19614277 | [1997/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801087 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801087 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C09D5/20 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
C08G18/10 (EP);
C09D175/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/307 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/42] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer feuchtigkeitsvernetzenden Einkomponenten-Polyurenthanmasse zur reversiblen Abdeckung eines festen Untergrundes | [1997/42] | English: | Moisture-curing one-component polyurethane composition for reversible covering of a solid base | [1997/42] | French: | Utilisation d'une composition de polyuréthane à un composant durcissable par l'humidité pour le revêtement réversible d'un support fixe | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 05.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58152064 ; | [A]GB1390153 (GUIDOTTI C SPA LAB) [A] 6 * page 1, line 9 - line 56 * * page 2, line 18 - line 45 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]EP0078936 (POLYPAG AG [CH]) [A] 5 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 26 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0376890 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 1 - line 18 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 42, Database accession no. 83-7911738, XP002033317 & JPS58152064 A 19830909 (FUJIKURA RUBBER WORKS LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |