EP0805348 - Arrangement for the diagnosis of malignant tissue by way of flourescence observation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/45] | Equipment and procedure for diagnosis of malicious tissue by means of fluorescence-observation | ||
[2003/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richard Wolf GmbH Pforzheimer Strasse 32 75438 Knittlingen / DE | [1997/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freitag, Lutz, Dr. Theo-Funccius-Strasse 2 58675 Hemer / DE | 02 /
Dankwart-Eder, Franz Wiesenstrasse 32 97270 Kist / DE | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Vollmann, Heiko, et al Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstrasse 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Vollmann, Heiko, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann, Musterbahn 1 23552 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105014.1 | 25.03.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | DE19961012536 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19612536 | [1997/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0805348 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0805348 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0805348 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
A61B5/0084 (EP,US);
A61B1/00186 (EP,US);
A61B1/043 (EP,US);
A61B1/0638 (EP,US);
A61B1/0646 (EP,US);
A61B5/0071 (EP,US);
Y10S607/901 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/17] | A61B1/06, G01N21/64, G01N21/00 | ||
Former IPC [1997/45] | G01N21/64, G01N21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/45] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Diagnose von malignem Gewebe durch Fluoreszenzbetrachtung | [2003/11] | English: | Arrangement for the diagnosis of malignant tissue by way of flourescence observation | [2003/49] | French: | Disposition pour le diagnostic de tissu malignant au moyen de l'observation de la fluorescence | [2003/11] |
Former [1997/45] | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Diagnose von malignem Gewebe durch Fluoreszenzbetrachtung | ||
Former [1997/45] | Equipment and procedure for diagnosis of malicious tissue by means of fluorescence-observation | ||
Former [1997/45] | Disposition et procedé pour le diagnostic de tissu malignant au moyen de l'observation de la fluorescence | Examination procedure | 23.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.02.2004 | ES | 05.06.2004 | DE | 01.10.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/14] | ES | 05.06.2004 | |
DE | 01.10.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | ES | 05.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4556057 (HIRUMA TERUO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-3,6 * column W *; | [A]DE4133493 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2254417 (JOUZA BIJAN) [A] 1,3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5419312 (ARENBERG IRVING K [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column A; figure 1; claim - *; | [AD]US5507287 (PALCIC BRANKO [CA], et al) [AD] 1,3 * column A * * column 4, line 16 - line 57; figures 1,2; claim - *; | [A] - ANDERSSON P S ET AL, "Fluorescence endoscopy instrumentation for improved tissue characterization", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002057412 [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [ ] - MEDICAL PHYSICS, JULY-AUG. 1987, USA, ISSN 0094-2405, vol. 14, no. 4, pages 633 - 636 |