EP0803446 - Packaging assembly as well as method and device for manufacturing the assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Gosebruch, Harald, Dr. Bürgermeister-Urban-Strasse 11 27283 Verden / DE | 03 /
Mutschall, Hugo Deelsener Strasse 6 27308 Kirchlinteln / DE | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [1997/44] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105082.8 | 26.03.1997 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | DE1996116153 | 23.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19616153 | [1997/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0803446 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0803446 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803446 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/50, B65B13/02, B65B11/10, B65B11/58, B65D71/02, B65D69/00 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
B65B25/146 (EP,US);
B65B11/58 (EP,US);
B65D71/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/44] | B65D71/50, B65B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/01] |
Former [1997/44] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Gebindeverpackung sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen derselben | [1997/44] | English: | Packaging assembly as well as method and device for manufacturing the assembly | [1997/44] | French: | Ensemble d'emballage ainsi qu'un procédé et un dispositif pour le réaliser | [1997/44] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.09.2003 | ES | 21.12.2003 | AT | 26.03.2004 | BE | 31.03.2004 | CH | 31.03.2004 | LI | 31.03.2004 | [2005/51] |
Former [2005/21] | NL | 10.09.2003 | |
ES | 21.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | NL | 10.09.2003 | |
ES | 21.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | NL | 10.09.2003 | |
ES | 21.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 10.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2741885 (ALLISON HERBERT S) [X] 1 * figures 1-8 * [A] 8,9; | [X]DE1586924 (SCHWABEN NUDELWERKE B BIRKEL S) [X] 1 * figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [XY]US3568591 (DUNLAP CLIFFORD E) [X] 8,9 * figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 10,11; | [X]US3987901 (DULLINGER KARL) [X] 1,3-5 * column 6, line 7 - line 68; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US4075815 (CARVER JR HERBERT K, et al) [A] 12 * figures 1-6B *; | [Y]GB2139175 (GAMBETTI MARIO BAUMER) [Y] 10,11 * page 3, line 93 - page 4, line 29; figures 2-10 *; | [X]DE4120925 (HANSA ANLAGENBAU GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 23 - line 41; figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE4138138 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [A] 8-12* column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 19; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]GB2261648 (GD SPA [IT]) [Y] 2 * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 18; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]EP0612661 (ROSENBERG GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 54; figures 1-5 * [A] 8,9; | [XY]JPH082548 (HEISEI POLYMER KK) [X] 1,3-5 * figures 1,3-5 * [Y] 2 |