EP0820144 - Piezoelectric resonator and electric component using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Unami, Toshihiko Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Jiro Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105402.8 | 01.04.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | JP19960208857 | 18.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20885796 | JP19970014584 | 10.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1458497 | [1998/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0820144 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0820144 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820144 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/17, H03H9/58, H03H9/205 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
H03H9/178 (EP,US);
H03H9/1014 (EP,US);
H03H9/605 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/04] | H03H9/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, SE [1998/04] | Title | German: | Piezoelektrischer Resonator und elektrisches Bauteil unter Verwendung derselben | [1998/04] | English: | Piezoelectric resonator and electric component using the same | [1998/04] | French: | Résonateur piézoélectrique et composant électrique en faisant usage | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 05.03.2003 | SE | 05.06.2003 | [2003/50] |
Former [2003/41] | FI | 05.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1544950 (CLEVITE CORP) [Y] 1-3 * page 3, column 1, line 3 - page 3, column 1, line 27; figure 1 * * page 5, column 1, line 38 - page 6, column 2, line 11; figures 5,6 *; | [YA]GB2280809 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 5 * * page 13, line 3 - page 13, line 22; figures 6-9 * [A] ,6; | [LE]EP0800269 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [LE] 1,4-7* the whole document * |