EP0801422 - Removing agent composition for a photoresist and process for producing a semiconductor integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwata, Keiichi, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Comp. Inc. Niigata Research Laboratory, 182, Aza-Shinwai Tayuhama, Niigata-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | 02 /
Karita, Tetsuya, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Comp. Inc. Niigata Research Laboratory, 182, Aza-Shinwai Tayuhama, Niigata-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | 03 /
Aoyama, Tetsuo, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Comp. Inc. Niigata Research Laboratory, 182, Aza-Shinwai Tayuhama, Niigata-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105547.0 | 03.04.1997 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | JP19960091521 | 12.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9152196 | [1997/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0801422 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0801422 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801422 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/321, G03F7/42 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
H01L21/02071 (EP,US);
G03F7/42 (KR);
G03F7/425 (EP,US);
H01L21/027 (KR);
H01L21/31133 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/42] | Title | German: | Reinigungsmittelzusammensetzung für Photoresist und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines halbleitenden integrierten Schaltkreises | [1997/42] | English: | Removing agent composition for a photoresist and process for producing a semiconductor integrated circuit | [1997/42] | French: | Composition décapante pour photoresist et procédé de fabrication d'un circuit intégré semi-conducteur | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 29.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH0728254 ; | [X]JPH07283204 ; | [Y]EP0578507 (EKC TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 1-4 * claims 2,10 *; | [A]EP0463423 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [PX]EP0723205 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PX] 1-4 * claims 6-10 *; | [A]EP0647884 (BAKER J T INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 95, no. 4, & JP07028254 A 19950131 (KANTO CHEM CO) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [Y] 1-4 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 96, no. 2, & JP07283204 A 19951027 (MITSUBISHI GAS CO) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - WAI MUN LEE, "A NEW APPROACH IN PHOTORESIST STRIPPING AND POST PLASMA ETCH/ASH WAFER CLEANING FOR SUBMICRON PROCESSES", EXTENDED ABSTRACTS, (19930101), vol. 93/1, page 488/489, XP000431791 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |