Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0803644
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.05.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] |
19.05.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] |
09.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.12.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.09.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
17.09.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.08.1999 |
First examination report |
|
06.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.05.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.09.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] |
12.09.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] |