EP0803644 - Four-stroke-cycle v-type engine of motorcycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUZUKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 300 Takatsuka-Cho Hamamatsu-Shi Shizuoka-Ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states SUZUKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 300 Takatsuka-Cho Hamamatsu-Shi, Shizuoka-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iio, Hiroshi 3-10-30, Takabayashi Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakai, Hiroyuki 1334-3, Kaketsuka, Ryuyo-cho Iwata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105569.4 | 03.04.1997 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | JP19960102885 | 24.04.1996 Original published format: JP 10288596 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0803644 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803644 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F02B61/02, F02F7/00 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
F02B61/02 (EP,US);
F02B75/22 (EP,US);
F02F7/006 (EP,US);
F02B2075/027 (EP,US);
F02B2075/1808 (EP,US);
F02B2275/18 (EP,US);
F02F2001/245 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1997/44] | Title | German: | Viertaktbrennkraftmaschine in V Bauart für Motorrad | [1997/44] | English: | Four-stroke-cycle v-type engine of motorcycle | [1997/44] | French: | Moteur 4 temps à cylindres en V pour motocyclette | [1997/44] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 11.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3128052 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [A] 1* abstract * |