EP0799907 - Liquid material vaporizer apparatus and gas ejection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukunaga, Yukio 1352-117 Mutsuura-cho, kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Murakami, Takeshi 3-9-8-302 Nakamagome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ogure, Naoaki 5-32-2 Chuo, Nakano-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Hongo, Akihisa 46-23 Zenbu-cho, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105636.1 | 04.04.1997 | [1997/41] | Priority number, date | JP19960110282 | 05.04.1996 Original published format: JP 11028296 | [1997/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799907 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799907 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/44 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
C23C16/4557 (EP,US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
C23C16/4486 (EP,US);
C23C16/45565 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verdampfen einer Flüssigkeit und Gasausstosseinrichtung | [1997/41] | English: | Liquid material vaporizer apparatus and gas ejection device | [1997/41] | French: | Vaporisateur pour matériaux liquides et appareil d'éjection de gaz | [1997/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02145768 ; | [X]DE4107756 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 7-9 * figure 2A *; | [X]EP0533201 (APPLIED MATERIALS JAPAN [JP]) [X] 10 * figure 4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900823), vol. 014, no. 390, Database accession no. (C - 0751), & JP02145768 A 19900605 (KOUJIYUNDO KAGAKU KENKYUSHO:KK) [X] 1,10 * abstract * |