EP0801028 - Method for selective recovery of salt components from nitrite/nitrate-containing, used hardening salts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Houghton Durferrit GmbH Industriestrasse 3 68169 Mannheim / DE | [1999/44] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states Durferrit GmbH Thermotechnik Industriestrasse 3 D-68169 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kremer, Matthias, Dr. Rheinstrasse 59 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
Wahl, Georg Weidertsweg 15 63517 Rodenbach / DE | 03 /
Wigger, Stefan Grünaustrasse 13 63457 Hanau / DE | 04 /
Gock, Eberhard, Prof. Dr. Kiefernbrink 16 38640 Goslar / DE | 05 /
Kähler, Jörg, Dr. Siebensternweg 9 38678 Clausthal-Zellerfeld / DE | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Hans-Ludwig, et al Evonik Degussa GmbH DG-IPM-PAT - Bau 1042 / PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1 45764 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Hirsch, Hans-Ludwig, et al Evonik Degussa GmbH DG-IPM-PAT - Bau 1042 / PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1 45764 Marl / DE | ||
Former [1999/44] | Hirsch, Hans-Ludwig, Dr., et al Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Marken Wolfgang Postfach 13 45 63403 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1997/42] | Weber, Wolfgang Degussa AG Fachbereich Patente Postfach 1345 63403 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105668.4 | 05.04.1997 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | DE1996114645 | 13.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19614645 | [1997/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0801028 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0801028 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801028 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C01D9/00, C01D3/08 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
C01D3/08 (EP,US);
C01D9/00 (EP,US);
C01F11/188 (EP,US);
C21D1/46 (EP,US);
C21D1/607 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur selektiven Wiedergewinnung der Salzbestandteile aus nitrit-nitrathaltigen Härtereialtsalzen | [1997/42] | English: | Method for selective recovery of salt components from nitrite/nitrate-containing, used hardening salts | [1997/42] | French: | Procédé de récupération sélective des constituants salins de sels de durcissement usés, contenant des nitrites et des nitrates | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 02.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE2400319 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE2400318 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [T] - WIGGER S ET AL, "RECYCLING CHLORIDISCHER HAERTEREIALTSALZE RECOVERY OF WASTE SALTS FROM HEAT TREATING FACILITIES", ERZMETALL, (199607), vol. 49, no. 7/08, pages 455 - 462, XP000615749 [T] 1 * the whole document * |