EP0801427 - Field effect transistor, semiconductor storage device, method of manufacturing the same and method of driving semiconductor storage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morii, Tomoyuki 3-4-10, Makami-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-11 / JP | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105778.1 | 08.04.1997 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | JP19960089234 | 11.04.1996 Original published format: JP 8923496 | JP19960092353 | 15.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9235396 | [1997/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0801427 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0801427 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/786, H01L29/788, H01L29/10, H01L29/49, H01L29/32, H01L21/336, H01L21/265, H01L21/30, H01L21/322 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
H01L29/78696 (EP,US);
H01L21/3003 (EP,US);
H01L29/1033 (EP,US);
H01L29/1054 (EP,US);
H01L29/42324 (EP,US);
H01L29/66757 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/42] | H01L29/786, H01L29/10, H01L29/788, H01L29/49 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/42] | Title | German: | Feldeffekttransistor, Halbleiter-Speicheranordnung, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Verfahren zum Steuern der Halbleiter-Speicheranordnung | [1997/42] | English: | Field effect transistor, semiconductor storage device, method of manufacturing the same and method of driving semiconductor storage device | [1997/42] | French: | Transistor à effet de champ, dispositif de stockage semi-conducteur, méthode de fabrication et méthode de commande du dispositif de stockage semi-conducteur | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/20] | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.01.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6425573 ; | [A]US4957877 (TAM SIMON M [US], et al) [A] 13,27; | [A]JPS59125648 ; | [A]FR2681472 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 22,23,27,28 * page 9, line 16 - line 29; figures 1,2 *; | [PXPA]JPH098313 | [XA] - MIYASAKA M ET AL, "EFFECTS OF SEMICONDUCTOR THICKNESS ON POLY-CRYSTALLINE SILICON THINFILM TRANSISTORS", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (199602), vol. 35, no. 2B, pages 923 - 929, XP000701012 [X] 1,3,4 * page 925, column R, line 10 - line 35; figures 1,7,8 * * paragraph 2. "Experiment" * [A] 22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.35.923 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890518), vol. 013, no. 213, Database accession no. (E - 759), & JP01025573 A 19890127 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-4,22 * abstract * | [A] - HUANG J ET AL, "Study of argon and silicon implantation damage in polycrystalline silicon", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, MAY 1986, USA, ISSN 0013-4651, vol. 133, no. 5, pages 993 - 995, XP002081538 [A] 1-4,22 * abstract * * page 995, column L, line 15 - line 22 * | [A] - CAO M ET AL, "STUDY ON HYDROGENATION OF POLYSILICON THIN FILM TRANSISTORS BY ION IMPLANTATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, (199506), vol. 42, no. 6, pages 1134 - 1140, XP000517158 [A] 1,3,22,23 * paragraph [0II.] * * paragraph [III.C.] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.387248 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841116), vol. 008, no. 250, Database accession no. (E - 279), & JP59125648 A 19840720 (OKI DENKI KOGYO KK) [A] 1,13,22,23,27,28 * abstract * | [PXA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 097, no. 005, & JP09008313 A 19970110 (SHARP CORP) [PX] 1,3,22 * abstract * [PA] 23 |