EP0803332 - Device for the pressing out of the pivot pin of a suspension joint and/or of a track rod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klann Tools Ltd. 13 Harrier Park Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states Klann Tools Ltd. 13 Harrier Park Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 7PL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weisshaar, Angelika Oderstrasse 118 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | Neymeyer, Franz Haselweg 20 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | Neymeyer, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Haselweg 20 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105821.9 | 09.04.1997 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | DE1996207447U | 24.04.1996 Original published format: DE 29607447 U | [1997/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0803332 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803332 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/02 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
B25B27/062 (EP,US);
B25B27/023 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53852 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/44] | Title | German: | Auspressvorrichtung für ein Achstraggelenk und/oder einen Spurstangenkopf | [1997/44] | English: | Device for the pressing out of the pivot pin of a suspension joint and/or of a track rod | [1997/44] | French: | Dispositif expulseur pour pousser le pivot d'une articulation de suspension et/ou d'une barre d'accouplement | [1997/44] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 30.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2169898 (MINDERMAN ROBERT A) [A] 1-4,6-8 * page 1, column R, line 14 - line 18; figure 3 *; | [DA]FR2134741 (FACOM); | [A]US3742570 (FELSER J) [A] 1 * column 1, line 20 - line 23; figure 6 *; | [DA]FR2188481 (SIFOA [FR]); | [A]US3846891 (ELG C) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0258594 (KLANN HORST) [A] 1 * figures 4-6 *; | [A]DE4434152 (KLANN HORST [DE]) [A] 1-4,6-8 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE4437046 (KLANN HORST [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * figures 1,2 * [A] 2 |