EP0807624 - RETINOIC ACID DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/47] | Means for the modulation of processes mediated by retinoid receptors and compounds useful therefor | ||
[2005/52] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SALK INSTITUTE FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDIES 10010 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla California 92037 / US | For all designated states BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | For all designated states LIGAND PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 9393 Towne Centre Drive, Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2009/33] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states THE SALK INSTITUTE FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDIES 10010 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla California 92037 / US | ||
For all designated states BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | |||
For all designated states LIGAND PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 9393 Town Centre Drive, Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, Roland M. 8615 La Jolla Scenic Road La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
Mangelsdorf, David J. 4771 Seaford Place San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 03 /
Heyman, Richard A. 147 Honeycomb Court Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 04 /
Boehm, Marcus F. 4007 Everts Street, 4J San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 05 /
Eichele, Gregor 2030 Swift Boulevard Houston, TX 77030 / US | 06 /
Thaller, Christina 2030 Swift Boulevard Houston, TX 77030 / US | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Polz, Leo, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Polz, Leo, Dr., et al Hoffmann Eitle Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/47] | Kolb, Helga, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105922.5 | 18.12.1992 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | US19910809980 | 18.12.1991 Original published format: US 809980 | [1997/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0807624 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0807624 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807624 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C403/20, A61K31/07 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
C12P7/64 (EP);
A61K31/07 (EP);
A61K31/19 (EP);
A61K31/20 (EP);
A61K31/203 (EP);
A61K31/23 (EP);
A61K31/232 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C403/20 (EP);
C07C57/26 (EP);
C07C59/46 (EP);
C07C59/80 (EP);
C07K14/70567 (EP);
C12P7/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/47] | Title | German: | RETINSÄUREDERIVATE | [2005/52] | English: | RETINOIC ACID DERIVATIVES | [2005/52] | French: | DÉRIVÉ D'ACIDE RETINOIQUE | [2005/52] |
Former [1997/47] | Mitteln zur Modulierung von Verfahren durch Retinoid Rezeptoren und dafür nützliche Verbindungen | ||
Former [1997/47] | Means for the modulation of processes mediated by retinoid receptors and compounds useful therefor | ||
Former [1997/47] | Procédés permettant la modulation de processus utilisant des récepteurs de rétinoides comme médiateurs et composés utiles dans ce contexte | Examination procedure | 10.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 07.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.11.2008 | 05.11.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93902758.7 / EP0617614 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2009
03.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Basilea Pharmaceutica AG Grenzacherstrasse 487 4005 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Bohest AG, et al, et al Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2009
Basilea Pharmaceutica AG Grenzacherstrasse 487 4005 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Bohest AG, et al, et al Postfach 160 CH-4003 Basel / CH | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.12.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/16] | Request for further processing for: | 06.06.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.08.2009 | BE | 12.08.2009 | CH | 12.08.2009 | DK | 12.08.2009 | IT | 12.08.2009 | LI | 12.08.2009 | NL | 12.08.2009 | SE | 12.08.2009 | ES | 23.11.2009 | [2011/28] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CH | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
LI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0237986 (SHUDO KOICHI [JP], et al); | [X]WO8900157 (MOLECULAR DESIGN INT [US]); | [X]FR2619309 (OREAL [FR]); | [X]EP0371264 (UNIV LOYOLA CHICAGO [US]); | [X]EP0376821 (OREAL [FR]); | [X]ES2022025 (UNIV VALENCIA ESTUDI GENERAL [ES]) | by applicant | FR2619309 | EP0376821 | EP0552624 |