blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0808796

EP0808796 - Process for the preparation of hydrogen peroxide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2001 [2001/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENICHEM S.p.A.
Piazza della Repubblica, 16
20124 Milano / IT
[1997/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Bianchi, Daniele
Via Valera, 16/C
Arese (Milano) / IT
02 / Bortolo, Rossella
Via Monte Grappa, 9
Novara / IT
03 / D'Aloisio, Rino
Via Romentin, 25/E
Novara / IT
04 / Ricci, Marco
Via Fra Dolcino, 19
Novara / IT
05 / Soattini, Sergio
Via Vallazza, 8
Cerano (Novara) / IT
[1997/48]
Representative(s)Gennari, Marco
EniTecnologie S.p.A. Patent and Licensing Dept. Via F. Maritano, 26
20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1997/48]Gennari, Marco
Eniricerche S.p.A., BREL, Via F. Maritano, 26
20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT
Application number, filing date97106075.114.04.1997
[1997/48]
Priority number, dateIT1996MI0101521.05.1996         Original published format: IT MI961015
[1997/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0808796
Date:26.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0808796
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.1997
ClassificationIPC:C01B15/027
[1997/48]
CPC:
C01B15/0275 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1997/48]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Wasserstoffperoxid[1997/48]
English:Process for the preparation of hydrogen peroxide[1997/48]
French:Procédé de préparation de peroxyde d'hydrogène[1997/48]
Examination procedure18.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/20]
21.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.1999Fee for grant paid
15.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS60191005  ;
 [DA]US4462978  (BRILL WILLIAM F [US]) [DA] 1,10 * column W *;
 [A]EP0229408  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 32 - line 50 * * column 2, line 28 - line 32 * * column 3, line 5 - line 42 *;
 [DA]US4711772  (JACOBSON STEPHEN E [US]) [DA] 1,8-11,27,29-32 * column W *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860220), vol. 010, no. 043, Database accession no. (C - 329), & JP60191005 A 19850928 (NIPPON CARLIT KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.