07.04.2006 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |
29.03.2006 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
21.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
17.01.2006 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
25.10.2005 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
05.10.2005 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
05.10.2005 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
13.07.2005 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
13.07.2005 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
10.01.2005 |
Appeal number |
|
27.08.2004 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
24.08.2004 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
06.08.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition |
|
30.06.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
30.06.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
25.05.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
08.04.2004 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
18.04.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] |
02.04.2003 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
07.02.2003 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
07.02.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
07.02.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
20.09.2002 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
09.08.2002 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
09.08.2002 |
Opposition filed |
published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] |
05.10.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] |
01.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.03.2001 |
First examination report |
|
19.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.12.2000 |
Change - representative |
published on 07.02.2001 [2001/06] |
29.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.06.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] |
06.04.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.07.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] |
19.06.1998 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] |
19.06.1998 |
Change - English title |
published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] |
15.05.1998 |
Publication of search report |
published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] |
12.09.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] |