Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0806394 | Global Dossier | 12.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96810287 | 06.05.1996 | EP97106340 | 17.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH1087213 | Global Dossier | 07.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96810287 | 06.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1075037C | 21.11.2001 | C | CN1166447 | 03.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96810287 | 06.05.1996 |