EP0806394 - Safety device for an elevator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55, Postfach 175 CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. HTL Benziwilstrasse 18 6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | 02 /
Woebcke, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. FH Fluhmattstrasse 8 6033 Buchrain / CH | [1997/46] | Application number, filing date | 97106340.9 | 17.04.1997 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | EP19960810287 | 06.05.1996 Original published format: EP 96810287 | [1997/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0806394 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/22 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
B66B5/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/46] | Title | German: | Sicherheitseinrichtung für eine Aufzugsanlage | [1997/46] | English: | Safety device for an elevator | [1997/46] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité pour ascenseur | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 07.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3441107 (THORNE BENJAMIN GRAHAM ET AL) [X] 1 * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 72; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]EP0498597 (POON OTTO L) [X] 1 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 50; figures 1-10 * [A] 2-9; | [AD]FR2654087 (SIMINOR SA) [AD] 1-9 * page 1 - page 2; figures 1-5 * |