EP0802173 - Process for producing heterocylic aromatic amine or arylamine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishiyama, Masakazu 3-5-8, Betsumei Yokkaichi-shi, Mie, 510 / JP | 02 /
Koie, Yasuyuki 26-14, Shiroyama 2-chome, Touin-cho Inabe-gun, Mie, 511-02 / JP | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/43] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106367.2 | 17.04.1997 | [1997/43] | Priority number, date | JP19960098388 | 19.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9838896 | JP19960184469 | 15.07.1996 Original published format: JP 18446996 | JP19960241724 | 12.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24172496 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0802173 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802173 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07B43/04, C07D295/02, C07D295/06, C07D295/08, C07D213/73, C07D215/38, C07D209/08 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
C07D295/033 (EP,US);
C07B43/04 (EP,US);
C07C209/10 (EP,US);
C07C213/02 (EP,US);
C07D213/74 (EP,US);
C07D295/023 (EP,US);
C07D295/073 (EP,US);
C07D295/096 (EP,US);
C07D317/66 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C209/10, C07C211/54 (EP,US);
C07C209/10, C07C211/55 (US,EP);
C07C209/10, C07C211/56 (US,EP);
C07C209/10, C07C211/61 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von heterocyclischen aromatischen Aminen oder Arylaminen | [1997/43] | English: | Process for producing heterocylic aromatic amine or arylamine | [1997/43] | French: | Procédé de production d'amines aromatiques hétérocycliques ou d'arylamines | [1997/43] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 08.09.1998 | Observations by third parties | 04.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2002
ADMISSIBLE Merck Patent GmbH Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2002
ADMISSIBLE Merck Patent GmbH Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | 28.10.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.03.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.03.2004 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/40] | 19.03.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.04.2004 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ANIL S. GURAM ANDANIL S. GURHAM ET AL, J.AM.CHEM SOC., (19940824), vol. 116, no. 17, pages 7901 - 7902, XP002035477 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00096a059 | [A] - FREDERIC PAUL ET AL, J.AM.CHEM.SOC., (19940629), vol. 116, no. 13, pages 5969 - 5970, XP002035480 [A] 1 * page FREW * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00092a058 | [DA] - JANIS LOUIE ET AL, TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (19950522), vol. 36, no. 21, pages 3609 - 3612, XP002035481 [DA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(95)00605-C | [DA] - JOHN P. WOLFE ET AL, THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19960209), vol. 61, no. 3, pages 1133 - 1135, XP002035482 [DA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo951844h | [PA] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960715), vol. 125, no. 3, Database accession no. 33853h, page 931, column l, XP002035483 [PA] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - JANIS,LOUIE, ORGANOMETALLICS, (1996), vol. 15, no. 14, pages 2794 - 2805 | [PA] - GRACE MANN ET AL, J.AM.CHEM.SOC., (19961225), vol. 118, no. 51, pages 13109 - 13110, XP002035479 [PA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja963273w | [PA] - MICHAEL S. DRIVER ET AL, J.AM. CHEM .SOC.-, (19960731), vol. 118, no. 30, pages 7217 - 7218, XP002035478 [PA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja960937t | other | US5576460 | - A.S.GURAM, R.A.RENNELS, S.L.BUCHWALD, "Eine einfache katalytische Methode zur Synthese von Arylaminen aus Arylbromiden", ANGEW. CHEM., WEINHEIM, (1995), vol. 107, no. 12, pages 1456 - 1459, XP000667226 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ange.19951071216 |