EP0818898 - Method and means for selecting digitally coded traffic messages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blischke, Frank, Dr. Richard-Wagner-Strasse 11 31141 Hildesheim / DE | 02 /
Goss, Stefan Fichtestrasse 11 31137 Hildesheim / DE | [1998/03] | Application number, filing date | 97106411.8 | 18.04.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | DE1996128086 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19628086 | [1998/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0818898 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0818898 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, G08G1/09 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
H04H20/55 (EP);
G08G1/093 (EP);
H04H60/16 (EP);
H04H20/59 (EP);
H04H2201/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Auswahl von digital kodierten Verkehrsmeldungen | [1998/03] | English: | Method and means for selecting digitally coded traffic messages | [1998/03] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la sélection de messages routiers numériques | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 19.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/42] | 21.08.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/42] | Appeal following examination | 09.04.2009 | Appeal received No. T1619/09 | 21.08.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE4445582 (DEUTSCHE AUTOMOBILGESELLSCH) [Y] 5,6 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 64 * [A] 1-4,7-11; | [A]US5438687 (BRAEGAS PETER ET AL) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 42; claims 11,12 * | [XY] - HELLAKER J ET AL, "Dynaguide Presenting Local Traffic Information Using RDS/TMC", IEEE, VEHICLE NAVIGATION AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS, (19920902), pages 20 - 25, XP010259476 [X] 1-4,7-11 * abstract * * page 21, paragraph 6 - page 23, paragraph 9 * [Y] 5,6 |