EP0816560 - Pressing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiermaschinen GmbH Postfach 19 70 89509 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henssler, Joachim Wilhelm-Mayer-Strasse 2 88213 Ravensburg / DE | 02 /
Loser, Hans Lessingstrasse 12 89129 Langenau / DE | 03 /
Steiner, Karl, Dr. Richard-Wagner-Weg 8 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | [1998/02] | Application number, filing date | 97106606.3 | 22.04.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | DE1996126420 | 01.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19626420 | [1998/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816560 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816560 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/02, D21F3/08 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
D21F3/0218 (EP,US);
D21F3/02 (EP,US);
D21F3/0227 (EP,US);
D21F3/086 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/02] | D21F3/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, SE [1999/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pressvorrichtung | [1998/02] | English: | Pressing device | [1998/02] | French: | Dispositif de pressage | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/26] | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2814682 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG); | [A]EP0241389 (GERLAND STOWE WOODWARD IND BV [FR]); | [A]DE3416423 (VALMET OY [FI]) |