EP0805063 - Semi-automatic shift implementation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Genise, Thomas Alan 449 North Lafayette Dearborn, Michigan 48128 / US | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106683.2 | 23.04.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | US19960649830 | 30.04.1996 Original published format: US 649830 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0805063 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0805063 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0805063 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/08, F16H63/44, // F16H59:02, F16H59:40, F16H59:42, F16H59:46, F16H59:70, F16H61:04 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/111 (EP,US);
B60W30/19 (EP,US);
F16H61/0248 (EP,US);
F16H61/702 (EP,US);
F16H63/502 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0045 (EP,US);
F16H2059/6823 (EP,US);
F16H59/0217 (EP,US);
F16H59/08 (EP,US);
F16H59/36 (EP,US);
F16H59/40 (EP,US);
F16H59/42 (EP,US);
F16H59/46 (EP,US);
F16H59/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | Halbautomatische Schaltdurchführung | [1997/45] | English: | Semi-automatic shift implementation | [1997/45] | French: | Réalisation semi-automatique de changement de vitesse | [1997/45] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 13.03.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01105929.2 / EP1101651 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5261298 (MARKYVECH RONALD K [US]) [X] 1,2,23,30,37,49,50,58 * column 2, line 43 - line 61 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 39 * * figure -; claims 1,5 * [A] 4,12,13,16-18,21,42,43,45 [Y] 3,6,8,9,24,27,31,34,47,48,51-54; | [XAY]EP0427000 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,10,23,25,30,32,37,49,50,58-60 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 25 * * column 6, line 33 - line 54; figures 2,3; claim 1 * [A] 12-14,16-19,21,42,43,45 [Y] 3,6,8,9,24,27,31,34,47,48,51-54; | [A]EP0413412 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1,58,60 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 21; figure -; claims 1,6,15 *; | [A]GB2241756 (SEM GROUP MANAGEMENT LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1,58,60 * figures 1,2,6; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0431677 (FORD NEW HOLLAND INC [US]) [A] 1,58,60 * abstract * |