EP0803292 - Method and apparatus for electrostatic powder coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 1-14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 1-14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuda, Shinichiro c/o Kao Corp., Reserch Lab. of 2-1-3 Bunka, Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Maruta, Masayuki c/o Kao Corp., Research Lab. of 1334 Minato, Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | 03 /
Sato, Yukiya c/o Kao Corp., Research Lab. of 1334 Minato, Wkayama-shi Wakayama / JP | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/44] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106823.4 | 24.04.1997 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | JP19960131414 | 25.04.1996 Original published format: JP 13141496 | JP19970041523 | 10.02.1997 Original published format: JP 4152397 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0803292 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803292 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B05B5/03, B05B7/04, B05D1/06 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
B05B5/0533 (EP,US);
B05B5/032 (EP,US);
B05B5/047 (EP,US);
B05D1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat für elektrostatische Pulverbeschichtung | [1997/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for electrostatic powder coating | [1997/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour déposition électrostatique des poudres | [1997/44] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.08.2000 | [2001/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3232088 (BEHR & SOHN HERMANN [DE])[A] 1; | [A]EP0306799 (BRENNENSTUHL KG HUGO [DE]) [A] 1; | [A]FR2682309 (PROTIME SA [FR]) [A] 1,2 |