EP0806519 - Low air permeability papermaking fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstenJohnson, Inc. 48 Richardson Road Kanata, Ontario K2K 1X2 / CA | [2001/43] |
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states JWI LTD 48 Richardson Road Kanata, Ontario K2K 1X2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Samuel M. 128 Lake Avenue West Carleton Place, Ontario K7C 1M1 / CA | 02 /
Despault, Marc P. 47 Langstrom Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K1G 5J5 / CA | 03 /
Harrison, James D. 63 Hewitt Way Kanata, Ontario K2L 3R1 / CA | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/46] | Morgan, James G., et al Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106832.5 | 24.04.1997 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | GB19960009761 | 10.05.1996 Original published format: GB 9609761 | [1997/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0806519 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0806519 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/00, D03D3/04 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
D21F1/0027 (EP,US);
D03D15/283 (EP,US);
D03D15/37 (EP,US);
D10B2331/04 (EP,US);
Y10S162/902 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3179 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/46] | Title | German: | Papiermaschinegewebe mit geringer Luftdurchlässigkeit | [1997/46] | English: | Low air permeability papermaking fabric | [1997/46] | French: | Toile à faible perméabilité à l'air pour machine à papier | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 14.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2006843 (JWI LTD) [Y] 1,2,4-8 * figures 4A,4B; claims 1,2,7,10 *; | [Y]GB2039555 (KUFFERATH GEB GKD) [Y] 7 * figures 4-7 *; | [XY]EP0580478 (COFPA [FR]) [X] 1-7 * column 4, line 19 - column 4, line 57 * * column 6, line 6 - column 6, line 16; figures 12,13; claims 1-3,17 * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]EP0590288 (KUFFERATH FRANZ FERDINAND DIPL [DE]) [Y] 7 * column 3, line 28 - column 3, line 35 *; | [Y]US5407737 (HALTERBECK WALTER [DE], et al) [Y] 8* column A; figures 5,6 *; | [Y]GB2292755 (SCAPA GROUP PLC [GB]) [Y] 1,2,4-8 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 2; figure 1; claims 1,2,7,13,14 * |