EP0805428 - Vehicular navigation display system with clock selection depending on the display format [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kume, Akihiro 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken, 444-11 / JP | 02 /
Katou, Daisuke 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken, 444-11 / JP | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/45] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106870.5 | 24.04.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | JP19960107084 | 26.04.1996 Original published format: JP 10708496 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0805428 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/16, H04N5/44 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
G09G5/395 (EP,US);
G08G1/0968 (KR);
G09G5/18 (EP,US);
G09G5/391 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0442 (EP,US);
G09G2360/02 (EP,US);
H04N7/0122 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/45] | Title | German: | Anzeigesystem für Fahrzeugnavigation mit anzeigeformatabhängiger Taktauswahl | [1997/45] | English: | Vehicular navigation display system with clock selection depending on the display format | [1997/45] | French: | Système d'affichage pour la navigation d'un véhicule avec sélection d'horloge en fonction du format d'affichage | [1997/45] | Examination procedure | 17.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 30.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/02] | 12.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0588499 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,3 * Abstract *; column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 8; figures 1,2 * * column 8, line 11 - column 10, line 51 * [A] 4; | [Y]EP0463867 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1,3 * Abstract *; page 5, line 27 - page 8, line 3; figures 1,2,22-25 * * page 11, line 8 - line 42 * * page 12, line 47 - line 54 * * page 15, line 9 - line 41; figure 31 *; | [A]JPH06183286 ; | [A]JPH07226914 ; | [A]EP0545341 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 2,4 * Abstract *; page 1, line 5 - line 32; figures 1-3 * * page 3, line 38 - line 50 * * page 4, line 39 - line 48 * * page 5, line 10 - line 17 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941005), vol. 18, no. 256, Database accession no. (M - 1683), & JP06183286 A 19940705 (ZANABUI INFUOMATEIKUSU K.K.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 95, no. 11, & JP07226914 A 19950822 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO. LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * |