EP0805336 - Route setting method and apparatus in navigation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukushima, Atsuhiko, Pioneer Elec. Corp. Kawagoe Works, No. 25-1 Aza-Nishicho Oaza-Yamada, Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Habu, Yuhiko, Pioneer Elec. Corp. Kawagoe Works, No. 25-1 Aza-Nishicho Oaza-Yamada, Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Böck, Bernhard advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Böck, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Jaeger, Böck & Köster, Patentanwälte, Egloffsteinstrasse 7 97072 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106954.7 | 26.04.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | JP19960111704 | 02.05.1996 Original published format: JP 11170496 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0805336 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0805336 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | [1999/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0805336 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
G01C21/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Eingeben von Routen in einem Navigationssystem | [1997/45] | English: | Route setting method and apparatus in navigation system | [1997/45] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour l'entrée de routes dans un système de navigation | [1997/45] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 19.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0348528 (AISIN AW CO [JP], et al) [X] 6,7,14,15 * page 6, line 1 - line 28 ** page 19, line 25 - page 20, line 16 *; | [A]US5243528 (LEFEBVRE REBECCA K [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 9, line 67 - column 10, line 22 *; | [A]EP0580167 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 13, line 32 - column 15, line 16; figure 23 *; | [A]US5291413 (TAMAI HARUHISA [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 6, line 8 - line 38; figure 1 * |