EP0805468 - Switch assembly with at least two rotary switches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2004/05] |
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klein, Hans-Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Schlesierstrasse 42 97078 Würzburg / DE | [1997/45] | Application number, filing date | 97107026.3 | 28.04.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | DE1996117163 | 29.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19617163 | [1997/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0805468 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0805468 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01H19/14 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
H01H19/14 (EP);
H01H19/11 (EP);
H01H19/585 (EP);
H01H19/64 (EP);
H01H2019/143 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/45] | Title | German: | Schalteranordnung mit zumindest zwei Drehschaltern | [1997/45] | English: | Switch assembly with at least two rotary switches | [1997/45] | French: | Ensemble interrupteur avec au moins deux interrupteurs rotatifs | [1997/45] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 07.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 18.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/26] | 27.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1219569 (BUSCH-JAEGER) [Y] 1-5,8-10 * column 4, line 3 - line 23 *; | [Y]DE4117031 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 49 *; | [Y]FR2441312 (DIEHL GMBH & CO) [Y] 6,7 * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 40 *; | [Y]GB1495880 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) [Y] 1,9,10 * page 2, line 5 - line 48 * |